CA SB1096 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on EQ. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on EQ. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.7 (commencing with Section 2721) to Part 2 of Division 1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Water and sewer system corporations: consolidation of service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on EQ. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2721 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1096 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1096 |