CA SB1094 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5915 and 5921 of, and to add Sections 5926 and 5927 to, the Corporations Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Nonprofit health facilities: sale of assets: Attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1094 Lara Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1094 Lara Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1094 Lara Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1094 Lara (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1094 Lara Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1094 Lara Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 22 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1094 Lara (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4971.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 27. Page 6666.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 6325.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6325.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider continued to August 22. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 22. Noes 24. Page 6131.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Holden. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 6). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 3655.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3309.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5926 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5927 | New Code | See Bill Text |