CA SB1090 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12463, 23110, 23124, 34460, 40471, 51191, 51191.3, 51192.1, 51192.2, 53243.4, 53892.1, 65302.10, 66442, and 66450 of, and to add Section 54712 to, the Government Code, to amend Sections 5473.8, 5473.11, and 5474.6 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 36622, 36623, 36629, and 36671 of the Streets and Highways Code, to amend Section 37212 of the Water Code, and to amend Sections 5, 8, 21, and 24 of, to add Sections 3.1 and 3.2 to, to repeal Sections 19, 20, and 22 of, and to repeal and add Section 3 of, Chapter 931 of the Statutes of 1951, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1090 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1090 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By SMYTH (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1090 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1090 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By SMYTH (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1090 Committee on GOV. & F. (Wolk) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 330, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6178.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6003.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (Corrected June 19.) | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3404.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3206.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-03-06 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |