CA SB1085 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65400 and 65915 of the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Density Bonus Law: qualifications for incentives or concessions: student housing for lower income students: moderate-income persons and families: local government constraints.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1085 Skinner et al (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2020-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 26).
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2020-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 26.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-03-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2020-03-18SenateMarch 31 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 31.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65400Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65915Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback