CA SB107 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, relating to the state budget, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2024.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2024-06-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-10AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2024-06-10AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2024-06-10AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 5789.)
2024-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-03-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 487.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-03-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.)
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback