CA SB107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1324.20, 1324.22, 1324.23, 1324.24, 1324.27, 1324.29, and 1324.30 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5847, 5892, 14126.022, 14126.023, 14126.027, 14126.033, and 14126.036 of, and to add Section 14126.032 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public health funding: health facilities and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 673.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1324.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |