CA SB107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1324.20, 1324.22, 1324.23, 1324.24, 1324.27, 1324.29, and 1324.30 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 5847, 5892, 14126.022, 14126.023, 14126.027, 14126.033, and 14126.036 of, and to add Section 14126.032 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health funding: health facilities and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 673.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1324.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1324.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1324.23Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1324.24Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1324.27Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1324.29Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1324.30Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14126.022Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14126.023Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14126.027Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14126.032New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14126.033Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14126.036Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5847Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5892Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback