CA SB107 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 33353 of the Education Code, relating to physical education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical education: California Interscholastic

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB107 Price (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-14 - Assembly - SB 107 Price Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB107 Price (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 230, Statutes of 2011.
2011-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2011-08-25 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2011-08-22 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2016.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-08-17 Ordered to special consent calendar.
2011-07-14 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2011-07-14 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2345.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-07-11 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2011-07-07 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-07-06 From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2011-06-23 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-28 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-03-25 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-03-25 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 458.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-03-23 Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2011-03-22 From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 359.) (March 16).
2011-03-08 Set for hearing March 16.
2011-02-10 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-01-14 From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
2011-01-13 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code33353Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_107&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20110113_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20110323_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20110707_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20110824_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20110906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20110316_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20110325_0931AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20110622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20110706_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20110714_1121AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20110822_0237PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback