CA SB1068 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12096.3.4 to the Government Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Governor’s Office of Business and Economic Development: Climate change.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 3307.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12096.3.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |