CA SB1063 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1197.5 and 1199.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Conditions of employment: wage differential: race or ethnicity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1063 Hall Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1063 Hall Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1063 Hall (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1063 Hall Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1063 Hall (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 866, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5403.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 6083.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, amended and ordered to third reading. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 4042.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4002.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 2). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1197.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1199.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |