CA SB106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 by amending Items 0530-001-0001, 4800-101-0001, 6440-001-0001, and 6610-001-0001 of, and adding Item 0530-495 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - Assembly - SB 106 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB106 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB106 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB106 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB106 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1726.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2399.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 2390.) |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 673.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |