CA SB106 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65583.2 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 50825, 50826, 50827, 50828, 50832, 50832.1, 50833, 50833.1, and 50834 of, and to add Section 50826.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 1234, 1234.2, 1234.3, and 1234.4 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 17052 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State Government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB106 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - SB 106 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB106 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - SB 106 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB106 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1894.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 2308.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 2250.) |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50825 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50826 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50826.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50828 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50832 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50832.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50833 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50833.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50834 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1234 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1234.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1234.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1234.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |