CA SB1055 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11546.6 to the Government Code, relating to the State Chief Information Officer.
Title
State Chief Information Officer: fingerprints: criminal
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Ashburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1055 Ashburn (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1055 Ashburn Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1055 Ashburn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1055 Ashburn Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1055 Ashburn (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 282, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-23 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4648.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6178.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-08-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-22 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-28 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3475.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-04-23 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-21 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3165.) | |
2010-04-07 | Set for hearing April 13. (For vote only.) | |
2010-04-06 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2010-03-12 | Set for hearing April 6. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-17 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |