CA SB1053 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - May 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 3549.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - May 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 3549.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.3 (commencing with Section 2839) to Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Licensed registered nurses and licensed vocational nurses: Nurse Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-18 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-18-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | May 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5. Page 3549.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2839 | New Code | See Bill Text |