CA SB1052 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 21175 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: judicial challenge: identification of parties and contributors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-18-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateApril 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21084.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21175New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback