CA SB1049 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25132 and 36900 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Cities and counties: ordinances: short-term rentals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1049 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Bauer-Kahan (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1049 Glazer et al (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1049 Glazer et al (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 9. Page 5412.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2020-06-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 3794.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3613.) (May 28). |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 25132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 36900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |