CA SB1049 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3910.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3910.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2501 of, and repeal Sections 2502 and 2503 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: local public entities: project labor agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - [04-25-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 25 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3910.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 2501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2502 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2503 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |