CA SB1046 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 352, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10235.50 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance: long-term care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1046 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1046 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1046 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 352, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5689.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4884.) (April 25).
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance Code10235.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1722Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code1751.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback