CA SB1045 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3539.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3539.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 49091.10 and 49091.14 of the Education Code, relating to school curriculum.
Title
School curriculum: parental review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [04-27-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | April 27 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3539.) Reconsideration granted. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49091.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49091.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |