CA SB1045 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14021.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal Drug Treatment Program: group outpatient drug free services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1045 Beall Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1045 Beall Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1045 Beall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1045 Beall Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1045 Beall (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4140.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5649.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5622.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3402.) (May 7). |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14021.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |