CA SB1041 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 105285, 105295, 105300, and 124125 of, and to add Section 105286 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Childhood lead poisoning prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1041 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1041 Leyva Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1041 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1041 Leyva Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1041 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 690, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6059.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6779.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4452.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 105285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 105286 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 105295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 105300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |