CA SB1038 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12940 of the Government Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Fair Employment and Housing Act: violations: personal liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1038 Leyva (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4394.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4302.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4722.) (April 17).
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback