CA SB1033 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - April 23 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
Pending: Senate Public Employees and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - April 23 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
Pending: Senate Public Employees and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 20792 to the Government Code, relating to public employees’s retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement: reciprocal benefits: actuarial liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20792 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1033 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1033 |