CA SB1030 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal Section 12810.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver records: points: distracted driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1030 Newman (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyJune 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4874.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4677.) (April 16).
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4517.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code12810.3Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback