CA SB1028 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 8385) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Electrical corporations: local publicly owned electric utilities: electrical cooperatives: wildfire mitigation plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1028 Hill Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1028 Hill Senate Third Reading By BIGELOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1028 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1028 Hill Senate Third Reading By BIGELOW (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1028 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6081.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4002.) (May 27). |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | May 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3392.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 761.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 761.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8385 | New Code | See Bill Text |