CA SB1027 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12892 of the Government Code, and to add Chapter 8.9 (commencing with Section 25790) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
State employee survey.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12891 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12892 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12893 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12893.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 25790 | New Code | See Bill Text |