CA SB1027 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3041.3 to the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parole: sex offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-13 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-05 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-16 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |