CA SB1019 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18005 and 34000 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: destruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | April 15 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3351.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 18005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 34000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |