CA SB1016 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 186.22, 186.33, 1170, 1170.1, 1170.3, 12021.5, 12022.2, and 12022.4 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Special Consent SB1016 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1016 Monning Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1016 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1016 Monning Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1016 Monning (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 887, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5495.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6058.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4041.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4001.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3521.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12021.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 186.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |