CA SB1012 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 786, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 18999.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeless multidisciplinary personnel team.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1012 Delgado Senate Third Reading By LIMÓN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1012 Delgado Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1012 Hertzberg (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 786, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6172.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6199.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6145.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 3).
2018-06-11AssemblyJune 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-07SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4967.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4814.) (April 24).
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure85Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18999.8Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback