CA SB101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 15845.2 to, and to repeal and add Section 15845 of, the Government Code, and to add Section 39614.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to state agencies, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB101 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2017-06-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-12AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-06-12AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2161.)
2017-06-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-06-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-05-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1035.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.)
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15845.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code39614.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback