CA SB1009 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 84757 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges: tutoring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4439.) (March 21).
2018-03-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2018-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code84757Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback