CA SB1007 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3308 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to the California Exposition and State Fair, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Exposition and State Fair: direct deposit: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1007 Pan et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1007 Pan et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3108.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 3308 | New Code | See Bill Text |