CA SB1006 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Set for hearing April 29.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 454.58 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: transmission capacity: reconductoring and grid-enhancing technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 454.58 | New Code | See Bill Text |