CA SB1002 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6253.9 of the Government Code, relating to public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public records: electronic format.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 5 SB1002 Yee (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1002 Yee Senate Third Reading By HALL (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1002 Yee (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-28 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2012-09-28 Vetoed by the Governor.
2012-09-11 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2012-08-31 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 3. Page 5116.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 6784.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-21 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-20 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-16 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2012-08-08 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-06-27 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-21 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2012-06-14 Referred to Coms. on G.O. and L. GOV.
2012-05-31 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-31 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-29 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-25 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3589.) (May 24).
2012-05-18 Set for hearing May 24.
2012-05-14 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2012-05-04 Set for hearing May 14.
2012-04-18 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 3207.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-09 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-03-30 Set for hearing April 17.
2012-03-29 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-03-12 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-02-16 Referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-02-07 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2012-02-06 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11085New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6253.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6253.91New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6278New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1002&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120312_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120329_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120409_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120529_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120621_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120820_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_bill_20120910_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120417_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120514_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120524_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120531_1133AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120620_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120627_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120816_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120831_0942PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1001-1050/sb_1002_vote_20120831_1152PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback