CA SB1001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 892, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 17940) to Part 3 of Division 7 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to bots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bots: disclosure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1001 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1001 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1001 Hertzberg (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 892, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 6132.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 6979.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 19).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4419.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4814.) (April 24).
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4696.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code17940New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code23104.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback