CA SB1000 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 111224) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Public health: sugar-sweetened beverages: safety warnings.
Sponsors
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Sen. Holly Mitchell [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] | Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Monning (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Monning (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3701.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3162.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 111224 | New Code | See Bill Text |