CA SB1000 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-25 - Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 315 and 583 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Yee (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Yee Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Yee (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Yee (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Yee Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1000 Yee (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |
2012-06-18 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and G.O. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 3697.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-23 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 3556.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Yee. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3557.) | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3513.) (May 14). | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-03 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3309.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 3205.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-03-27 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-02 | Set for hearing March 20. | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. | |
2012-02-07 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 583 | New Code | See Bill Text |