CA SB100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 399.11, 399.15, and 399.30 of, and to add Section 454.53 to, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program: emissions of greenhouse gases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB100 De León (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-09-11AssemblySeptember 11 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-09-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-09-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-01AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-07-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2017-07-05AssemblyJuly 5 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-26AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 9 p.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 25).
2017-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2017-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 9).
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2017-05-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2017-05-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-04-17SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback