CA SB10 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 27771 of the Government Code, and to add Section 1320.6 to, to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 1320.7) to Title 10 of Part 2 of, and to repeal Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 1268) of Title 10 of Part 2 of, the Penal Code, relating to pretrial release and detention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pretrial release or detention: pretrial services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB10 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 10 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Hertzberg et al (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5535.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 31. Page 6413.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6412.)
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-08-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1308.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-01SenateMay 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-04SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 598.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-03-09SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2017-01-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-01-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code27771Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1268Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1269Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1270Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1270.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1270.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1275New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1275.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1277Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1278Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1284Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1288Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1289New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1295Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1318Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1318.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1318.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1318.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1319Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1319.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1320.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code815Repealed CodeCitation Text
Penal Code821Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code825Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback