CA SB10 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 100522 to the Government Code, relating to health care coverage, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB10 Lara Urgency Clause Concurr (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - SB 10 Lara Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Lara (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2016.
2016-06-10 Approved by the Governor.
2016-06-03SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2016-06-02SenateUrgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4125.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-06-01SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 5048.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-27AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18).
2016-04-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 26).
2016-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2016-04-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-09-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2015-07-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2015-07-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2015-06-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and A. & A.R.
2015-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 1300.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1145.) (May 28).
2015-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 28.
2015-05-11SenateMay 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 11.
2015-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 795.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-17SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2014-12-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100522New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12099.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12100.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14102.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_10&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20141201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20150602_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20150707_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20150909_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20160413_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20160428_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20160527_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20160602_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20160610_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20150428_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20150511_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20150528_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20150603_0607PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20160414_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20160426_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20160518_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20160531_0429PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20160602_1114AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback