CA SB10 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44932, 44936, 44939, 44940, and 44944 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: dismissal, suspension, and leave of absence procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44932 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44936 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44939 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44944 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_10&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20121203_introduced.html |