CA SB10 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 265, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1050 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and veterans: Veterans' Home Allied Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-18 - Assembly - SB 10 Evans Third Reading Urgency By COOK (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Evans Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 265, Statutes of 2011.
2011-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2011-08-23 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2011-08-18 In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-08-18 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2451.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-08-15 From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2011-07-14 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2011-07-13 From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2011-06-29 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-28 Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2091.)
2011-06-08 Hearing postponed by committee.
2011-05-23 Referred to Com. on V.A.
2011-05-16 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-05-16 Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 983.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-04 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-03 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2011-04-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-04-14 Set for hearing May 2.
2011-04-13 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-29 Set for hearing April 12.
2011-01-20 Referred to Com. on V.A.
2010-12-07 From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
2010-12-06 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1050Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_10&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20101206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20110425_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20110819_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_bill_20110906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20110412_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20110516_0146PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20110629_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20110713_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_10_vote_20110818_0955AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback