CA SB1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14526.5 of, to add Sections 14033, 14110, 14526.7, 14556.41, and 16321 to, to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 14460) to Part 5 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Sections 63048.66, 63048.67, 63048.7, 63048.75, 63048.8, and 63048.85 of, and to repeal and add Section 63048.65 of, the Government Code, to add Section 43021 to the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 99312.1 of, and to add Sections 99312.3, 99312.4, and 99314.9 to, the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 6051.8, 6201.8, 7360, 8352.4, 8352.5, 8352.6, and 60050 of, to add Sections 7361.2, 7653.2, 60050.2, and 60201.4 to, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 11050) to Part 5 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 2104, 2105, 2106, and 2107 of, to add Sections 2103.1 and 2192.4 to, to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 800) to Chapter 4 of Division 1 of, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 2030) and Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 2390) to Division 3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Section 4156 of, and to add Sections 4000.15 and 9250.6 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - Assembly - SB 1 Beall Third Reading Urgency By FRAZIER (Y: 54 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Beall et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2017.
2017-04-28 Approved by the Governor.
2017-04-26SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
2017-04-24SenateOrdered to enrgrossing and enrolling.
2017-04-06SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 26.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25.)
2017-04-06Assembly(Ayes 54. Noes 25.)
2017-04-06AssemblyArt. IV. Sec. 8(b)(1) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2017-04-06AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-04-06SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 652.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-04-03SenatePublished April 3 at 2:39 p.m.
2017-04-03SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-03SenateSenate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 561.)
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 584.) (April 3).
2017-03-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-30SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2017-03-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 327.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-01SenateSet for hearing March 8.
2017-02-28SenateMarch 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-02-24SenateSet for hearing March 1.
2017-02-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 253.) (February 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2017-02-16SenateSet for hearing February 22.
2017-02-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 192.) (February 14). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-02-03SenateSet for hearing February 14.
2017-02-02SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H., EQ., and GOV. & F.
2017-01-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-01-26SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2016-12-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
2016-12-05Senate(Corrected December 6).
2016-12-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14033New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14110New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14526.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14526.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14556.41New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code16321New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code63048.66Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.67Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.75Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.8Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code63048.85Repealed CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code43021New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code99312.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code99312.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code99312.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code99314.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code60050Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code60050.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code60201.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6051.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6201.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7360Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7361.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code7653.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code8352.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code8352.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code8352.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2103.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code2104Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2105Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2106Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2107Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2192.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code4000.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code4156Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code9250.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback