CA SB1 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38576 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006: market-based compliance mechanisms: exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38576 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_1_bill_20141201_introduced.html |