CA SB1 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 1.86 (commencing with Section 34191.10) to Division 24 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 21094.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to economic development, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Sustainable Communities Investment Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB1 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Steinberg (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1 Steinberg (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 3009.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 1093.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1004.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 667.) (April 23). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 290.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34191.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21094.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |