CA AR99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-23)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5000.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Lupus Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Lupus Awareness Month.

Sponsors

Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 5000.).
2018-05-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2018-04-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-10AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback