CA AR97 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4687.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4687.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cambodian Genocide Memorial Week.
Title
Relative to Cambodian Genocide Memorial Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4687.). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |