CA AR91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5845.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5845.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to World Refugee Day.
Title
Relative to World Refugee Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5845.). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced. |