CA AR87 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-22-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4375.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-22-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Read. Adopted. (Page 4375.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Arts Education Month.
Title
Relative to Arts Education Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4375.). |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced. |